Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Complaint For Money (Ltd) case represented by Patenaude & Felix, against Sharon Wrenn, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management196 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryComplaint For Money (Ltd) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions157 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time157 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/06 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15. Not Applicable |
|
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SHARON WRENN SERVED ON 03/23/06 WITH FEES OF $47.00. Not Applicable |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.