Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Alberts, Amanda, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Kinsella, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Taylor, Katherine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTaylor, Katherine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Court Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | *Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Plaintiff |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EXHIBITS PLACED ON CAL SHELF FOR HEARING ON 02/26/2024 DEPT 2 |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received EXHIBITS |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filed SUMMARY OF FACTS; FILED BY PRO PER DEFT |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents Good afternoon, we are returning this for the following reason: exhibits must be filed over the counter. |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed PLAINTIFF'S SMALL CLAIMS BRIEF |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED KEVIN KINSELLA WITH SC-100 PLTFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT IN PERSON ON 1/11/2024 |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment COMM TAYLOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.