Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Piechota, Toni, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mcclure, Damon Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with O'Mara, J Kent presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Received PLTFF EXHIBITS SENT TO COURT ROOM SUPERVISOR |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED RAMON MCCLURE W/CLAIM AND ORDER ON 9/7/2020 |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.