Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jctka Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mintz Marshall G., Mintz Marshall Gary, against Xxxxxxxxxx, represented by Gerber Jonathan L., Saltzman Mark Elliott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Case Assignment -
Date: July 10, 2018Summons -
Date: July 10, 2018Complaint -
Date: July 10, 2018Declaration - of Marshall G. Mintz
Date: September 07, 2018Motion to Quash Service of Summons -
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment -
Date: October 17, 2018Opposition - Opposition to motion to quash service
Date: October 25, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons;)
Date: November 08, 2018Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 21, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 30, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 20, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 07, 2019Order for Publication
Date: January 07, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: February 07, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: February 13, 2019General Denial
Date: March 13, 2019Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 29, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: May 08, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL
Date: May 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: May 22, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 15, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 01, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: October 22, 2019Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: November 25, 2019Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: January 21, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 22, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: January 28, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 05, 2020Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons;))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT )
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Disqualify Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to quash service)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings To Advance Hearing On Motion To Disqualify))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Mark E. Saltzman)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Advance Hearing On Motion To Disqualify)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion To Disqualify Defendant's Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MARSHALL G. MINTZ RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN T )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 05/22/2019)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 05, 2020Motion to Compel (Verified Answers without Objections, to Form Interrogatories, Set Two)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.