Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mulhearn James, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Taylor Benjamin, Taylor Benjamin Samuel, against Fefer Jason, Freeman Brian, Full Stack Finance Llc, Heartbeat Technologies Inc., represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, Thompson Coe & O'Meara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gerald Rosenberg presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management190 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time271 days |
Substitution of Attorney -
Date: July 03, 2018Notice - Of Demurrer
Date: July 11, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: August 17, 2018Opposition - To Demurrer
Date: August 17, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees -
Date: August 30, 2018Other - - Civil Deposit
Date: August 30, 2018Other - - Civil Deposit
Date: September 04, 2018Notice - Notice of posting jury fees
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees -
Date: September 05, 2018Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED )
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00
Date: October 19, 2018Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information (of counsel for plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's (Full Stack Finance, Inc) Demurrer to ...))
Date: October 19, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2018Notice (OF POSTING OF JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.