Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
13700 Saticoy Llc, 9450 Topanga Properties Llc, Colorado Wellness Research Llc, Edsons Investments Inc., Health Wellness Holdings Llc, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Health Wellness Holdings Llc, Law Office Of Kenneth R. Morris, Morris Kenneth Robert, against 13700 Saticoy Llc, 9450 Topanga Properties Llc, Colorado Wellness Research Llc, Edsons Investments Inc., Nygard Inc., (total of 15) See All represented by Cole Jonathan Berres, Nemecek & Cole, Robinson Jon David, Stoner William Edward, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management184 days |
Filing DateJune 05, 2017 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice (Amended Notice of Hearing Dates for Joint Motions)
Date: February 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: EDSONS INVESTMENTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Separate Statement in Support of motion to Compel; Filed by: EDSONS INVESTMENTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B293178; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: JOHN K. PIERSON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: JOHN K. PIERSON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: December 15, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 07, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: May 01, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: April 13, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: June 11, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: May 23, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion for Contractual Attorney's Fees
Date: July 20, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion
Date: July 20, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion for Advancement of Court Costs
Date: July 20, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion of Pierson for Attorney's Fee
Date: July 20, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees
Date: July 20, 2018Opposition - To Motion to Compel
Date: August 29, 2018Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 04, 2020Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 04, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DATES FOR JOINT MOTIONS
Date: February 24, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 23, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL JOINT MOTION TO SEAL RECORD
Date: February 23, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO SEAL RECORD
Date: March 03, 2021Amended Complaint - Third
Date: July 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2017Complaint
Date: June 05, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Second Amended Complaint
Date: April 02, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2019Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint to State Derivative Claims
Date: December 07, 2018Objection - OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: April 26, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2020Complaint
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00CCP 170.6 Application Filed (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER )
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00CCP 170.6 Application Filed (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER )
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees and first papers )
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation (for additional time to respond )
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees )
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice (of posting jury fees )
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of order )
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of order granting Deft additional time to respond to complaint )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (filed by Nemecek & Cole )
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Demurrer (to FAC )
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (portions of FAC )
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Motion (FOR CONTRACTUAL ATTORNEYS FEES )
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID K. WILLINGHAM )
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of demurrer to FAC )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (Nemecek & Cole)
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Demurrer (to FAC )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (Health Wellness Holdings LLC )
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Nemecek & Cole; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: EDSONS INVESTMENTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid PAID BY NEMECEK & COLE FOR APPELLANT; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF KENNETH R. MORRIS IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APPLIC )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice (OF CLARIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to FAC )
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Response (to motion to strike portions of FAC )
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to motion to strike )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (to request for judicial notice in support of demurrer to FAC )
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to demurrer to FAC (other than Health Wellness) )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to demurrer to FAC )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ((OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE: LISA MARIE PARKER, LICENSE #13441) )
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion (for advacement of litigation expenses )
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint (No summons issued )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike portions of SAC )
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (to request for judicial notice in support of demurrer )
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (LISA MARIE PARKER CSR 13441 )
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT ALPINE CONSULTANTS,LLC FOR CONTRACTUAL ATTORNEY'S FEES )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR CONTRACTUAL ATTORNEY'S FEES )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO PIERSON LAW FIRM'S MOTION FOR CONTRACTUAL ATTORNEY' FEES )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Objection (TO DECLARATION OF KENNETH MORRIS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMO OF P&A; )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint (JURY TRIAL DEMANDED )
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ((OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE: CHERI BULLOCK, LICENSE #4714) )
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Receipt (JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (MOTION TO COMPEL CONTD TO 9-18-18 8:30 AM DEPT O )
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (with proof of service)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Separate Statement (of questions and responses)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (further responses to request for identification and production of documents)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Fourth Amended Complaint to State Derivative Claims)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of of entry of case reassignment order to Dept O)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Defendant John K. Pier...))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of Trial and Final Status Conference Dates)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Response (Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objection to Motion for Leave 04-02-19)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Objection (to Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiffs? Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Brief Continuance of Au...))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants John K. Pierson, Pierson Law Firm, Tont...))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Plaintiffs' fifth Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00in Support of Demurrer to Firth Amended Complaint and Related Motion to Stirke
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (John K. Pierson (Set One))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B293178)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Portion of Fifth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Fifth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Fifth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Fifth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer to Fifth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Defendants John K. Pierson, Pi...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Date and Time of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference Hearing Time Change)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference Re: Co...))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs? Position Statement for September 17, 2020 Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Joint Motion to Seal Record)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference Regarding Status of Dismissals)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Request (for dismissal )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion (for attorneys' fees )
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (portions of SAC )
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice (of intent to appear by telephone )
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Demurrer (to SAC )
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (further resp to request for ident and prodct of docts; sancts )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (to provide compliant verifications )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to SAC )
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.