Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael Lina M., against Jackson Pamela L., Smith Pamela L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Nancy L. Newman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Writ issued
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: October 18, 2016Default Judgment
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Declaration ( OFMARIO D. MORALES IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI ESQ. IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 120(B)(2)(A),(B) )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO THE COUNTY OF VENTURA AND PLACED IN ATTY FOLDER FOR CALWEST )
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Request to Enter Judgment
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Default Entered (AS TO PAMELA L. JACKSON AKA PAMELA L. SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL ENTERED )
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued (ABSTRACT ISSUED AND PLACED IN ATTY FOLDER FOR CALWEST )
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED IN THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. )
Date: November 06, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: March 22, 2016Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Filed Writ of Exec (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED )
Date: March 22, 2016Request for Entry of Default (as to pamela l. jackson aka pamela l. smith, an individual recv'd )
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Order (FOR JUDMGENT AND COURT'S ACCEPTANCE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI RE: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI RE: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (as to pamela l. jackson aka pamela l. smith, an individual recv'd )
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI ESQ. IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 120(B)(2)(A),(B) )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued (ABSTRACT ISSUED AND PLACED IN ATTY FOLDER FOR CALWEST )
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED IN THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. )
Date: November 06, 2017Filed Writ of Exec (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED )
Date: March 22, 2016Default Entered (AS TO PAMELA L. JACKSON AKA PAMELA L. SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL ENTERED )
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Order (FOR JUDMGENT AND COURT'S ACCEPTANCE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Declaration ( OFMARIO D. MORALES IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO THE COUNTY OF VENTURA AND PLACED IN ATTY FOLDER FOR CALWEST )
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.