Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ben-Shitrit Nathan, Tikosky Jacob, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Weissman Aaron J., against Tikosky Jacob, represented by Berke Michael N., Berke Michael Norman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 13, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time1866 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Answer (TO COMPLAINT )
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed ( DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THIS X-COMP. ON 7/25/14 )
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases ( REL/W - LC083978)
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-06-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2014-06-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTD TO 10-16-14 )
Date: 2014-06-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC )
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-06-20T00:00:00Notice (OF 6/12/14 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2014-06-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-06-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF )
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF )
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JACOB TIKOSKY ON 5/20/14 )
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-10-22 00:00:00
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-19 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation & Order
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Notice (To Attorneys Re: Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: March 08, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: September 21, 2018Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference))
Date: November 01, 2018Trial Brief
Date: August 21, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.