Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dayan Irus Inc., Kiumarz Lenhard Inc., Mazaheri Morton R., Mazaheri Kiumarz, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Gilanians Alex, Greenberg Amie S., Steinberg S. Keven, against Chaparli Fereidoun, Emil Ghotanian, First American Title Insurance Commercial, Footohiasli Farkhonde, Ghotanian Emil, (total of 7) See All represented by Behrouz Shafie & Associates, First American Law Group, Freedman & Taitelman, Shafie Behrouz, Talaie Mohammad Ali, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Nancy L. Newman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management433 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions824 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1707 days |
Complaint
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING )
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Demurrer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELEIVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE FAILURE TO ATTACH EXHIBITS )
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Motion for an Order (DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS )
Date: 2014-03-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2014-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Demurrer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC )
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; )
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; )
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS TO S. KEVEN STEINBERG )
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS; )
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF HEARING )
Date: 2014-07-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ORDER )
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-11-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (OF MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS )
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2014-11-21T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2014-11-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-11-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed (IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULING OF MOHAMMAD A. TALAIE'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAT DEFTS MOTIONS TO BE RELEIVED AS COUNSELE )
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint (IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Demurrer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFT HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC'S MTN TO STRIKE )
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Motion for an Order (TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT )
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Notice (OF DEMURRER & MTN TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR )
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Amended Notice (OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service (RE DEFT HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER )
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (REGARDING MEET AND CONFER )
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Demurrer (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Amended Notice (OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING, ETC. )
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL )
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MTN FOR ORDER )
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF BEHROUZ SHAFIE )
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF HARRY SADEGHI )
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Amended Notice (OF HEARING; )
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - FEES DEPOSITED W/COURT OF $1,297,433.70 )
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Notice (OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH THE SUPERIOR COURT )
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF DEFT/X-COMP'S DEMURRER )
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (RE: (POPOSED) JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFT. HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC )
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES )
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued (ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED )
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Demurrer (TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE )
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FOR: DIDAR GLOBAL TV )
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FOR: KIUMARZ LENHARD, INC. )
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL )
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FOR: KIUMARZ MAZAHERI )
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; )
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Demurrer (TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN )
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Judgment (OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC )
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT HUDSON 1861 BUNDY, LLC )
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ELECTION TO PROCEED ON ITS THRID AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Motion (TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint (IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed (TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Com (PARTY SERVED: HARRY SADEGHI, AN INDIVIDUAL )
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Notice-Case Reassignment and Order (DEPT P )
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Statement of Damages
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Default Entered (AS TO: HARRY SADEGHI, AN INDIVIDUAL - ENTERED )
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: HARRY SADEGHI, AN INDIVIDUAL - RECEIVED )
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (incorrect name: EMIL STEPHANIE true name: EMIL GHOTANIAN )
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Reply (BRIEF TO OPPOSTION TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RECONSIDERATION ETC. )
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order (DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS )
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (RESPONSES TO PLTFF KIUMARZ MAZAHERI'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES )
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order (DEEMING ADMITTED THE TRUTH OF FACTS AND GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS )
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (RESPONSES TO PLTFF KIUMARZ MAZAHERI'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION )
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF BEHROUZ SHAFIE, ESQ. )
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL TO MAY 31, 2017 )
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD ALEX GILANIANS FROM 6-23-17 - 7-12-17 )
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPONSES AND COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; )
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT )
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPONSES AND COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE; )
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Judgment (ON SANCTIONS )
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALEX GILANIANS )
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Notice (MOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SANCTIONS )
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (of mandatory settlement conference )
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF CLAIMS OF LEASEHOLD INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY )
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice (TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PER CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1987 )
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (BC657319 )
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND THE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE )
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (PSC1703064 )
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; )
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (SHARON CAHN CSR #6210 )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Stipulation (REGARDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (JAMIE ONUKI CSR 13904 )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (AUDREY LEHMAN, CSR #12738 )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Order (RE: RELEASE OF CIVIL DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL )
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF BEHROUZ SHAFIE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Lien Notice
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Opposition (TO EXPARTE APPLICATION )
Date: June 06, 2018ExParte Application
Date: June 06, 2018Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND PLACED IN ATTY FOLDER FOR DDS. )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HUDSON 1861 BUNDY,LLC )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00ExParte Application (TO SEEK RELIEF FROM A LIEN )
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: June 15, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.