Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sinay Soror, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Burg & Brock, Thalheimer Bernard J., against Abrams Michal Im, Campbell Gregory C.D., represented by Austin Brownwood Cannon & Santa Cruz, Law Offices Of Kirk & Zurawski, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2011 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time572 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Date: 2012-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2012-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 05, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: February 19, 2013Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Association of Attorneys
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (jury deposit )
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Order-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2013-02-19T00:00:00Notice Assign.-Med Hrg Date
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00Notice Assign.-Med Hearing Date
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: April 05, 2013Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATE IS SIGNED BY JUDGE STONE THIS DATE )
Date: 2012-10-16T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Date: 2012-03-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
Date: April 05, 2013Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Michael Im Abrams xc )
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) ( WITH PREJUDICE AS TO MICHAEL ABRAMS )
Date: April 05, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.