Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vahedi Fatemeh H., Vahedi Hossein G., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gernsbacher David L., against Atacador Hanna J., Bank Of America N.A., Countrywide Bank F.S.B., Countrywide Financial Corporation, K.G.V. Investments Inc., (total of 15) See All represented by Barton Klugman & Oetting, David F. Wood, Reed Smith Llp, Wood David F., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jacqueline A. Connor presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management238 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time476 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department I Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEI, Jacqueline A. Connor, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Case Previously Dismissed Judge: Jacqueline A. Connor |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department I Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Case Previously Dismissed) - |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department I Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEI, Jacqueline A. Connor, Presiding Final Status Conference (2) OSC AS TO ATTY FOR FTA ON 6-6-113) OSC RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT JT 4-29-11) - Off calendar, case dismissed. Judge: Jacqueline A. Connor |
|
June 29, 2011 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 29, 2011 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by HOSSEIN G. VAHEDI (Plaintiff); FATEMEH H. VAHEDI (Plaintiff) |
|
June 21, 2011 | Hearing |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 21, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.