Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dove-Reitter Bianca, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ghahreman Kyan Chrisopher Law Offices Of, against Marina Airport Building Ltd, Marina Towers, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Inc., Trizec Properties Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Dunbar & Associates, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with John A. Kronstadt presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryPremises Liablty (E.G. Slip & Fall (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeReclassified-Limited-Santa Monica |
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION TO DISMISS/TERMINATING SANCTIONS; DECL OF K.C. GHAHREMAN. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Subpena Record Filed by Interested parties |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not held-Rmvd ADR-Other Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (RECEIPT FOR RECORD RE: TRANSFER OF CASE FILE SENT TO SANTA MONICA LIMITED ON JUNE 4 2008 ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEN, John A. Kronstadt, Presiding Motion for Sanctions (MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONSAND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THEAMOUNT OF $1,690.00;) - Motion Denied Judge: John A. Kronstadt |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEN, John A. Kronstadt, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status - Status Conference Held Judge: John A. Kronstadt |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer (CASE TO LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT; ME ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. DUNBAR IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.