Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tsukiyama, Nathan Keala, Gambrell, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yochelson, David, against Davidson, Diane L, Cameron, Colin Alexander, Raggion, Carl William Iii, Raggio, Carl W, represented by Maki, Kevin M, Pasarow, Stephen C, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions453 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time2961 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
January 29, 2009 | disposition of remaining cross complaints | ||
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - disposition of remaining cross complaints scheduled for 01/29/2009 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by CAMERON, COLIN on 01/13/2009. | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - disposition of remaining cross complaints scheduled for 01/29/2009 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | consolidated with lead case SC048929 on 08/04/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.