Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
National Credit Acceptance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pugh, John J., against Caligiuri, Wendy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions228 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4427 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
February 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/17/2012. | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Money Judgment) generated. | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Post $185.00; Interest $517.07) filed by NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC on 05/07/2008. | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | 10/03/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC (Issuing abstract of judgment) Receipt Number: 610030075 for $15.0 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.