Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A.,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Force, J Robert, against Modafferi, Nicoletta A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4427 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 02/10/2012. | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (UnSatisfied) filed by CHASE BANK USA, N.A., on 06/12/2007. | |
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/01/2006: Writ of Execution for Money Issued for Ventura County in the amount of $7529.01 | |
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/01/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by CHASE BANK USA, N.A., (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 612040158 for $15.0 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.