Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tamayo, Josefina, Nava, Enrique, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Tamayo, Josefina, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3399 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/21/2006: Decree Changing Name filed | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/21/2006: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME Hearing: GRANTED | |
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/17/2006: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change filed | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/02/2006: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/02/2006: Order to Show Cause re: Change of Name filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.