Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schillo, Frank, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nadel, Russell J, against Raven, Dave, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions32 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time4177 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment filed by SCHILLO, FRANK on 11/29/2010. | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/15/2005: Writ of Possession ( OF REAL PROPERTY ) issued to Ventura County RETURNED and filed | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Judgment by Court After Trial filed and entered as follows: | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Writ of Possession of Real Property (Limited) issued for County of Ventura Receipt Number: 512060413 for $7.0 | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Application and Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession filed. | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Attorney fees are $1500.00 | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Judgment entered against WILLIAM DAVID RAVEN | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: (SIMI) COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. TIME ESTIMATE: 000 days 0:30 hours. Hearing: JUDGMENT ORDERED | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Judgment Ordered as follows: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.