Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Loeb, Steven S, against Schor, Julian B, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3459 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 02/10/2012. | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Issue date 10/23/07, Ventura County, without satisfaction.) filed by UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS on 07/15/2008. | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/14/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 609140231 for $15.0 | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/14/2006: Writ of Execution for Money Issued for Los Angeles County in the amount of $50858.17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.