Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Janjikian, George Yousef, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aghabegian, Alan, against Ruiz, Rene, Ruiz, Gavino, Rojas, Rene, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time3923 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event | 11/03/2005: (SIMI-LC) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILED POS OF S&C PER ORDER FILED 8-23-05 Hearing: VACATED | |
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 10/31/2005: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/29/2005: (SIMI-LC) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILED POS OF S&C PER ORDER FILED 8-23-05 Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/28/2005: Order GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF OSC TO 11/3/05 filed | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/26/2005: P'S MOTION TO CONTINUE OSC, DECLARATION OF ALAN AGHABEGIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by GEORGE YOUSEF JANJIKIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.