Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oportun Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ramirez, Cecilia Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.