Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oportun Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Santos, Patsy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
562 SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL *Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION Notes: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: PATSY MARIE SANTOS WITH SC-100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT ON 7-11-2020 |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
562 SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL *Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: PLTF |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION Notes: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.