Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kmj Properties, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bruner, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: November 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLTF; DEFENDANT SHALL PAY PLTF THE SUM OF $3600.00 PLUS $50.00 COST FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $3650.00 |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED DENNIS BRUNER WITH PLTFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER AND 2 FORMS OF EVIDENCE ON 2/23/2020 BY PERSONAL SERVICE |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.