Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estevez, Olivia, Starbird, Michael Fred, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rodriguez, Patricia Elayne, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with O'Mara, J Kent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeO'Mara, J Kent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Received DEFTS EXHIBITS |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORDER ON REQUSET TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER ON REQ TO POSTPONE TRIAL SENT TO COMM O'MARA |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Req for Postponement of Hearing after service (SC) FILED BY DEFT PATRICIA ELAYNE RODRIGUEZ |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED OLIVIA ESTEVEZ AND MICHAEL FRED STARBIRD WITH SC-150 REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL ON 9-14-2020 |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Received PLTFF'S EXHIBITS |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.