Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oportun, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Salas, Ramon Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time199 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION Notes: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS MINUTE ORDER *Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; COMM. O'MARA |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.