Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oportun, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lizaloa Jimenez, Marcos Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal CASE DISMISSED ON 08/24/2020 W/OUT PREJUDICE; FILED BY PLTFF OPORTUN INC |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MARCOS ANTONIO LIZALOA JIMENEZ WITH SC-100 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT ON 7-19-2020 |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE J. KENT O'MARA |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.