Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Apoyo Financiero, Rodriguez, Blanca Estela Gutierrez, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST SCANNED Notes: EXHIBIT LIST VERIFIED | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION Notes: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
562 SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL *Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List PLNTF/PET EXHBT LIST Notes: PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT LIST |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED:BLANCA ESTELA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ WITH CLAIM AND ORDER ON 1/8/20 FILED BY PLTFF |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.