Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Demarais, Christian, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Wilkinson, Troy M., against Guillen, Brenda, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; TROY WILKINSON, ESQ FOR THE PLAINTIFF |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Pay Judgment to Court ORDER/REQ FOR PYMTS Notes: DENIED ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE TO REQUEST Notes: RSP TO REQ TO MAKE PYMTS BY JDGMT CREDITOR FILED BY CHRISTIAN DEMARAIS |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Pay Judgment in Installments REQ INSTALL PYMTS Notes: REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS (SMALL CL) |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: PO BOX 531, CHICO CA 95927 FOR DEFT |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: EXHIBITS SUBMITTED TO COURT SERVICES |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST SCANNED Notes: EXHIBIT LIST VERIFIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.