Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Elizabeth Stevens, Adams, Stevens Dba, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hendricks,, Hendricks, Cari, Keller Williams Realty, Roseville, represented by To, Be Entered, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time471 days |
*Trial de Novo
Date: February 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME & PLACE OF TRIAL DE NOVO *Trial de Novo SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed ORD DESTROY EXHIBITS Notes: ORDER TO DESTROY EXHIBITS SIGNED AND FILED BY JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE Notes: ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate - Small Claims SC APPEAL ABND/DISM Notes: SC APPEAL ABANDONED OR DISMISSED |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS:STIPULATION TO VACATE JDMT AND FOR SETTLMNT BY DEFT |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
563 SC TRIAL DE NOVO *Trial de Novo SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.