Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mckeough, Bethany, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against International Gymnastics Cente, R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
December 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | RULING ISSUED Notes: RULING ISSUED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAINTIFF, BETHANY MCKEOUGH *** AGAINST *** DEFENDANTS, INTERNATIONAL GYMNASTICS CENTER, INC FOR THE PRINCIPAL AMOUNT OF $379.00 PLUS COSTS OF $30.00 FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $409.00. | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision TAKEN UND SUBMISSION Notes: HON. STEPHEN L. MOCK |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS MINUTE ORDER *Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HON. STEPHEN L. MOCK PLTF BETHANY MCKEOUGH PRESENT, SWORN & TESTIFIED. DEFT JOSE FLORES FOR INT'L GYMNASTICS CENTER PRESENT, SWORN & TESTIFIED. DEFTS REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS DENIED. MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED INTERNATIONAL GYMNASTICS CENTER/ DIEGO GARCIA WITH PLTFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT ON 09/04/15 AND MAILED ON 09/04/15 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.