Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arnold, Melissa, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Jmc Partners Inc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER SCANNED Notes: MINUTE ORDER SCANNED | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision TAKEN UND SUBMISSION Notes: BY REFEREE J KENT O'MARA Action: RIS |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER SCANNED Notes: MINUTE ORDER SCANNED | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLAINTIFF S&T EVELYN ANTONNE FOR DEF S&T COURT RECEIVES PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 1: FOLDER OF DOCS COURT RECEIVES DEFENDANT'S EXHBITS A: PACKET OF PHOTO AND DEF'S B: PACKET OF DOCUMENTS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JMC PARTNERS ON 3-31-14 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: -0-. COURT DATE: 4-17-14. |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.