Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahans Furniture, Stores, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Aguilera, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with O'Mara, J Kent presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JESUS AGUILERA ON 1-13-11 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $35.00. |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Filed FICT BUS NAME DECL Notes: FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.