Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daggett, Casey, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Northern Californi, A Collection Services, Cribb, Steven D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170.6 CHALLENGE RCVD Notes: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST JUDGE/COMM White filed a t counter. ///skb |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court PLAINTIFF CASEY DAGGETT PRESENT- S&T; DEFENDANT STEVEN CRIBB PRESENT-S&T; MARK ANDERSON (VICE PRESIDENT OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICES) PRESENT-S&T. DEFENDANT DOES NOT OWE PLAINTI FF ANY MONEY. MEMORANDUM OF COSTS TO FOLLOW. COURT WI LL NOT RECUSE HERSELF AS REQUESTED BY PETITIONER. COU RT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE OF A WRIT ISSUED IN SACRAMEN TO COUNTY CASE NUMBER 05AM00398 RELFECTING A LEVY IN AMT OF $7,527.68. Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170.6 CHALL AGAINST* Notes: 170.6 CHALLENGE IS: NOT HONORED BY JUDGE WHITE |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170.6 CHALL AGAINST* Notes: 170.6 CHALLENGE IS: HONORED BY COMM BERONIO |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF PRESENT DEF PRESENT PLTFF WILL NOT STIP TO REF REED CNT 7/28/08 1100 DEPT 9 FOR CT Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170.6 CHALLENGE RCVD Notes: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST JUDGE/COMM BERONIO |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON (6-9-08) BY ? (CAN NOT READ THE SIGNATURE). MAY NOT BE PROPER SERVICE. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON (6-9-08) BY M. ANDERSON (MAY NOT BE PROPER SERVICE). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.