Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daggett, Casey, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Boschken, Steve, Spector, Christy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET REF/UNC Notes: REFUSED/UNCLAIMED: ADDRESSED TO: CASEY W. DAGGETT |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL AND RECEIPT FOR RECORDS-FILE DELIVERED TO SACRAMENT SUPERIOR COURT | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: OF ASSIGNMENT (ORIG. IN FL 04-2490) | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Recusal 170.1CCP AGAINST* Notes: RECUSAL BY JUDGE/COMM REED. KNOWS DEFENDANT IN CASE |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LTR FROM DEFENDANT Notes: RECEIVED LETTER FROM CHRISTY L. SPECTOR. |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Defendant Claim CLM OF DEFT-SM CLMS Notes: CLAIM OF DEFENDANT - SMALL CLAIMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.