Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahans Furniture, Stores, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Arias, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: ISSUED 11-16-10 SOLANO COUNTY. |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: MEMO OF COSTS: -0-; CREDITS: -0-; INTEREST: $496.44. |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SOLANO COUNTY. |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL CLARISSA ANDRADE APPEARING FOR MCMAHANS DEFENDANT APPEARING WITNESS'S SWORN PLTFF SWORN & TESTIFIED DEF SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JAIME ARIAS ON 7-23-08 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR JAIME ARIAS. FEE: $30.00. |
|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.