Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sah, Ram N, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Sturgeon Construct, Ion, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court PLTFF PRESENT DEF PRESENT PULL TEST RESULTS TO BE SUBMITTED BY 7/21/08 Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision TAKEN UND SUBMISSION |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT CTS MTN-TRIAL Notes: CONTINUANCE COURTS MOTION OF TRIAL |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: DEF'S CLAIM TO RAM SAH ON 6-6-08 BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: $43.00. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLAINTIFF PRESENT TOM ERICKSON & SANDRA GASCON APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF SWORN & TESTIFIED TOM ERICKSON & SANDRA GASCON SWORN & TESTIFIED CNT FOR FURTHER CT 06/26/08 8:15AM D-10 Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Defendant Claim CLM OF DEFT-SM CLMS Notes: CLAIM OF DEFENDANT - SMALL CLAIMS |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: MICHAEL JOSEPH STURGEON BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: -0-. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.