Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Les Schwab Tire Ce, Nter, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gomez, Antonio, Gomez, Cesar, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3051 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3051 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Referral to Mediator/Investigator REF TO MEDIATION |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation MEDIATION AGRM FILED |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL MARIBEL GARCIA APPEARING FOR LES SCHWAB DEFENDANTS APPEARING MEDIATION AGREEMENT FILED. NO JUDGMENT ENTERED IF SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETED Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: CESAR GOMEZ ON 2-27-07 BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: $ 30.00. |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ANTONIO GOMEZ ON 2-27-07 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.