Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santillan, Guillermo, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lodi Equipment, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation MEDIATION AGRM FILED |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Referral to Mediator/Investigator REF TO MEDIATION |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLAINTIFF PRESENT SPENCER HINSON APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE POSTPONEMENT Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORD GRANTING* Notes: ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARI NG. |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: PER DEF (SPENCER HINSON) AT COUNTER, CORRECTED ADDRES S TO: 724 HARBOR BLVD., W SACRAMENTO, CA 95691. |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Req for Postponement of Hearing after service (SC) REQ FOR POSTPONEMENT Notes: REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.