Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cashcall Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gill, Dorothy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1666 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1666 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ORD DETERM CLM EXMPT |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Opposition to Claim of Exemption OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM EXMP GRANTED Notes: FUNDS ORDERED RETURNED TO DEBTOR |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Opposition to Claim of Exemption OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed REPLY* Notes: DEFT DOROTHY GILL'S REPLY TO PLTFF'S NOT OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY DOROTHY GILL |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM OF EXEMPTION |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC HRG CLM OF EXMPT Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption NTC OPPOSE CLM EXEMP Notes: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.