Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hansen, Kristepher E, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Nixon, Steve, Sharp, Susan, Walker, Darren James, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: SOS TRUCKING ON 12-10-07 BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 12-10-07. FEE: $30.00. |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: DARREN JAMES WALKER ON 12-10-07 BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: STEVE NIXON ON 12-10-07 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: SUSAN SHARP AKA SUSAN NIXON ON 12-10-07 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: 30.00. |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.