Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford, Jared, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Sah, Ram N, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment SATISFACTION JUDGMNT Notes: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF PRESENT DEF PRESENT Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: Served Ram Sah by sub-service to Cheon See an adult o ver 18 at home on 4-30-07. Fee: $30.00.//RP |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.