Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bueno, Andrea, Gorbett, Amber, Hoeger, Kerry L, Jura, Skye E, Tzou, Harriet H, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cincotta, Andrea, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time115 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: PER PLAINTIFF, SKYE JURA AT COUNTER, CHANGED MAILING ADDRESS TO: 4101 INNOVATOR DRIVE, #727, SACRAMENTO, CA 95834 |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES |
|
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF PRESENT TZOU, JURA DEF NP Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court REFEREE REED; CLERK NAVARRETTE PLAINTIFF'S PRESENT (EXCEPT FOR KERRY HOEGER) DEFENDANT NOT APPEARING WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFFS SWORN & TESTIFIED CNT: FOR FURTHER TRIAL 08/16/07 8:15AM Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE POSTPONEMENT |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Req for Postponement of Hearing after service (SC) REQ FOR POSTPONEMENT Notes: REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT. |
|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ANDREA CINCOTTA ON 5-2-07 BY PERSONAL SERVICE . FEE: $30.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.