Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dantzler, Richard, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Pacini, Christy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2976 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2976 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.