Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Contreras, Agripina, Contreras, Ruben, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hernandez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3437 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3437 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
506 MTN DISM LACK PROSEC Motion to Dismiss Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: Served Jose Hernandez on 9-26-06 by Substitute servic e. Documentation left at door. Fee: 0.00. (Advised def may not be acceptable proof of service if defend ant does not appear.).///RP |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.