Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pierini, Robert, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Pierini, Janice, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3883 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORD DSM FOR DELAY IN PROSEC | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS MINUTE ORDER Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES; CASE DSM FOR LACK OF PROSEC Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON 2-18-05 BY JANICE PIERINI. |
|
February 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK NOTO THIS COURT DOES NOT HAVE JURISDICTION COURT REFERS PLAINTIFF TO FAMILY LAW JUDGE Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERTIFIED MAIL #7160 3901 9848 6150 5793 JANICE PIERINI |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.