Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Plumbing Md Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Granda, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion DEF PRESENT PLTF NOT PRESENT NOTARIZED SETTLEMENT AND GENERAL RELEASE AGREEMENT RECIEVED AND FILED BY COURT Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed AGREEMENT* Notes: SETTLEMENT AND GENERAL RELEASE AGREEMENT FILED NOTARIZED AND SIGNED BY PLTF AND DEF CERT COPIES SENT BY CLERK TO PARTIES |
|
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing HEARING ON DISMISSAL OF TRIAL DE NOVO DEF PRESENT PLTF NO PRESENT TRIAL DE NOVO DISM NOTORIZED SETTLEMENT AND GENERAL REALEASE AGREEMENT RECIEVED AND FILED BY COURT COURT ADOPTS SETTLEMENT Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial de Novo PLAINTIFF NOT APPEARING DEFENDANT JOSE GRANDA APPEARS DEFENDANT PRESENTS UN-NOTORIZED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STATES THAT PARTIES HAVE REACHED A STIPULATION. DEFENDANT W/DRAWS REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO. CASE CONTINUED FOR NOTORIZED AGREEMENT CONTINUED FOR DISMISSAL OF TRIAL DE NOVO 5/5/06 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT 8 Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed SUBPOENA FILED Notes: PARTY SERVED: MICHAEL FARIAS ON 12-29-05. |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed SUBPOENA FILED Notes: PARTY SERVED: DAVE (EMPLOYEE OF PLUMBING MD). |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER FROM DEF MAILED TO PLAINTIFF. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.