Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo County Or&R, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Flores, Martiniano, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time57 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL NO APPEARANCES Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON 2-3-05 BY C SCHNEIDER. MAY NOT BE PROPER SERVICE. |
|
February 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERTIFIED MAIL #7160 3901 9848 6150 5991 MARTINIANO FLORES |
|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.