Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eusebio, Eduardo S, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Spector, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC |
|
September 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF SWORN & TESTIFIED DEFENDANT SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: EDUARDO EUSEBIO ON 8-31-05 BY SUB-SERVICE TO: MICAELA EUSEBIO, WIFE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
September 06, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED Notes: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF. | |
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Defendant Claim CLM OF DEFT-SM CLMS Notes: CLAIM OF DEFENDANT - SMALL CLAIMS |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JOE SPECTOR ON 7-27-05 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.