Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Louks, Peter, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Magana, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: YOLO COUNTY |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Returned EXHIBIT RETURN Notes: Peter Louks picked up plaintiff exhibits.//RP |
|
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC ENTRY SM CLM TMP |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF SWORN & TESTIFIED DEFENDANT SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ARMANDO MAGANA ON 4-6-05 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.