Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo County Or&R, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mitchell, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE - defendant deceased. FEE: $30.00.//RP |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET REF/UNC Notes: REFUSED/UNCLAIMED: ADDRESSED TO: MIKE MITCHELL |
|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERTIFIED MAIL #7160 3901 9848 6150 5069 MIKE MITCHELL |
|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.