Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Oil Co Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Strong, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3820 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORD DSM FOR DELAY IN PROSEC | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS MINUTE ORDER Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES; CASE DSM FOR LACK OF PROSEC Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.